EL-Bey v. Menefee et al (MAG+)

Plaintiff: Walter-El Alkemet Shakur EL-Bey
Defendant: Alfonza Menefee, Walter Hill and Tuskegee University
Case Number: 3:2014cv00047
Filed: January 21, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) Plaintiff's 102 objection is OVERRULED; (2) The 101 Recommendation is ADOPTED; (3) Plaintiff's 75 motion for default judgment/judgment as a matter of law is DENIED; (4) Defendant's 76 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; (5) This action is DISMISSED with prejudice; and (6) Costs are TAXED against Plaintiff for which let execution issue. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/8/2015. (kh, )
November 21, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon an independent review of the file and upon consideration of the 55 and 58 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The Objections are OVERRULED, except as to Plaintiff's § 1983 cla im for false arrest by Tuskegee University campus police officers in the Bursar's Office on June 13, 2013; (2) Defendant Menefee's motion to dismiss (Doc. # 42 ) is DENIED; (3) Defendant Tuskegee University's original motion for summa ry judgment (Doc. # 25 ) is DENIED as moot; (4) Except as to Plaintiff's claim for false arrest, Defendant Tuskegee University's amended motion for summary judgment (Doc. # 47 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Tus kegee University are DISMISSED with prejudice; and (5) This case, with regard to Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Menefee and Plaintiff's claim against Tuskegee University for false arrest, is REFERRED BACK to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/21/14. (scn, )
August 26, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 41 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant Alfonza Menefee's 29 Motion to Dismiss the original complaint or, in the alternative, Motion for Definite Statement is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/26/2014. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EL-Bey v. Menefee et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter-El Alkemet Shakur EL-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfonza Menefee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuskegee University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?