Rogers v. South Star Logistics, Inc., et al.

Plaintiff: Jimmie Rogers
Defendant: South Star Logistics, Inc. and Gill Singh
Case Number: 3:2014cv00179
Filed: March 14, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Bullock
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2016 139 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) plf's 116 MOTION for cost in the amount of $4,768.23 is GRANTED in accordance with Rule 54(d) of the FRCP and 28 USC 1920; (2) plf's 138 MOTION to Tax Interest on Judg ment is GRANTED; interest on the judgment will be assessed in accordance with the rate described in 28 USC 1961; (3) execution may issue in the amount of $500,000, plus costs and post-judgment interest. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/27/16. (djy, )
June 2, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) The Defendants' Motion to Exclude (Doc. # 41 ) is GRANTED to the extent that the Plaintiffs will have to establish a proper evidentiary foundation as to the facts of the accident before Paul Dillard may present h is opinion on Mr. Gill's actions during the accident at issue in this case, as further set out; (2) The Defendants' Motion in Limine (Doc. # 44 ) is GRANTED to the extent that the Plaintiffs will have to establish a proper evidentiary foun dation before offering Exhibit 17 or Exhibit 21, and the Objections to those Exhibits, found in Doc. # 48 , are SUSTAINED to the same extent, as further set out; (3) The Defendants' first objection to the Plaintiffs' Witness List (Doc. # [ 43]) is SUSTAINED, as further set out; (4) The parties are DIRECTED to confer and agree on a redacted transcript of any deposition of Aman Brar expected to be offered by the Plaintiffs in the first phase of their case in chief and an edited video of any deposition of Aman Brar expected to be offered in that phase so as to conform with the previous Order (Doc. # 81 ) and the effect of this order, and to file a Notice of Compliance no later than Thursday, June 4, 2015, and to do the same in regard to the deposition of Defendant Gill; (5) Objections to Deposition Designations not disposed of in this order will be disposed of in a later order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on June 2, 2015. (scn, )
May 29, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) The 45 Motion in Limine, together with all objections relating to this issue, are GRANTED and SUSTAINED, provisionally, subject to the procedure further set out in this order; further directed that no later than Wedn esday, June 3, 2015, Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file a brief setting out in detail the witnesses, testimony, and exhibits (whether objected to or not) they will offer in support of these contested claims, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on May 29, 2015. (scn, )
May 28, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) The Defendants' first Motion in Limine (Doc. # 40 ) is GRANTED, as further set out; (2) The Defendants' third Motion in Limine (Doc. # 42 ) is DENIED as moot; (3) The Defendants' sixth Motion in Limine (Doc. # 46 ) is DENIED, as further set out; (4) The Defendants' seventh Motion in Limine (Doc. # 47 ) is GRANTED to the extent that the records of Dr. Waldrop and Dr. Bernard will be excluded, along with any testimony by the Plaintiffs about their doctors' statements to the Plaintiffs; and DENIED to the extent that the Plaintiffs may testify about their own experiences and symptoms; (5) The Defendants' second Objection to the Witness List (Doc. # 43 ) is SUSTAINED as to Jimmie Rogers, Jr.. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on May 28, 2015. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. South Star Logistics, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Rogers
Represented By: Michael J. Crow(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Star Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gill Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?