Chambers et al v. Groome Transportation of Alabama, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nettie Chambers, Annie L. Adams, Johnny Allmond, Makeda Barnes, Kevin Bartlett, Adolphus Billingslea, Mattie Brown, Steve Cannon, Ernest Chappell, Jr., Lavelle Cox, Ruben Cox, Paul Cruz, John Dillard, Tracy Eden, Janice Ferrell, William Finley, Melvin Fredrick, Justin Greene, Geraldine Gunn, Eugene Hart, Jeremiah Heard, Jacqueline Hinson, Danita Jackson, Bobby Jones, Billy Kirk, Tiffany Lee, Jason Levi Lewis, Robert Moore, Jr., Dow Perry, Felicia Randolph, LaTwanika Rhodes, Martha D. Rocha, Christopher Rogers, Gregory Rowell, Randy Ruffin, James M. Smith, Willie Frank Smith, Charles Tate, Debra Thomas, Lakecia Thomas, Keosha Traylor, James Vines, Michael Watson, Joann Yancey and Cassandra Young
Defendant: Groome Transportation of Alabama, Inc., Harold V. Groome, Jr., Harold V. Groome, III and Christopher Groome
Case Number: 3:2014cv00237
Filed: April 2, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Chambers
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: ORDERED that 1. The Class Representatives and Class Members are hereby awarded damages in the amount of $106,000 to be paid in accordance with the Amended Settlement Agreement and shall be paid from the Settlement F und of $110,000. 2. The named Class Representatives are hereby awarded enhancement awards in the amount of $2,000 each which shall be paid from the Settlement Fund of $110,000. 3. Class Counsel are hereby awarded attorneys' fees i n the amount of $87,319.57, for their work on the WARN claims, to be paid from the Administrative Fund; 4. Class Counsel are hereby awarded attorneys fees in the amount of $50,787.84 for their work on the FSLA claims, in accordance with the amended settlement agreement. 5. Class Counsel are hereby awarded expenses in the amount of $12,680.35, to be paid from the Administrative Fund 6. As of the date of entry of final judgment, Plaintiffs and each member of the Settlement Class who have not opted out in accordance with the Settlement Agreement and Class Notice, on their own behalf, shall be deemed to have released each and all of the Defendants from the released claims. 7. As of the date of entry of final judgment, Plaintiffs, Settlement Class Members, and Defendants, including all persons, firms, and corporations who might otherwise be entitled to claim through them, shall be deemed to have released the parties from any claims that may have arisen out of this action. 8. As of the date of entry of final judgment, all Release provisions shall be given full force and effect in accordance with each and all of their express terms and provisions, including those terms and provisions relating to unknown, unsuspected, or fu ture claims, demands, or causes of action. 9. Plaintiffs and all members of the Settlement Class, other than those who have opted out pursuant to the Settlement Agreement and Class Notice, are hereby barred and enjoined from the institution and prose cution, either directly or indirectly, of any other actions in any court asserting any and all Released Claims against any and all Released Parties as described in the Release. 10. Class Counsel shall continue to make attempts to locate any member of the Settlement Class who has not been found, not returned a Class Action Notice form, or whose settlement check was returned by the United States Postal Service for insufficient address or any other reason, for a period of 180 days. Funds shall be h eld under the direction of class counsel in the Settlement Fund and available to be claimed by that member during the Payment Period of 180 days from the date of entry of Final Judgment. To the extent any funds remain in the Settlement Fund after all distributions are complete, Plaintiffs' counsel are directed to pay those funds over to a charity mutually agreed upon by counsel for the parties. 11. Without affecting the finality of the Judgment, the Court hereby retains jurisdiction for pur poses of implementing the Agreement and reserves the power to enter additional orders to effectuate the fair and orderly administration and consummation of the Agreement and Settlement, as may from time to time be appropriate, and resolution of any a nd all disputes arising thereunder.The Court will, by separate order, enter a final judgment dismissing this action against the Defendants, with prejudice, on the merits. The 65 Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plaintiffs' 64 Application for Award of Attorney's Fees, Expenses, and Enhancement Award for Class Representatives be and are hereby TERMINATED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/17/2015. (kh, )
September 1, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: ORDERED that the 55 Amended Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, including certification of a settlement class, approval of a notice plan, and setting of a fairness hearing is granted as furth er set out in order; A fairness hearing, pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 23(e), is scheduled to be held before the court on November 17, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4-B at the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Mo ntgomery, Alabama 36104; It is further ORDERED that the parties' 41 joint motion for preliminary approval of settlement agreement be and is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/1/2015. (furn: WS, Calendar)(kh, )
August 26, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that Groome Transportation's 8 Motion to Compel Arbitration is GRANTED as to Plaintiff Annie L. Adams. Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. §§ 34, Plaintiff Annie L. Adams is ORDERED to submit this dispute to arbitration in the manner provided for in the arbitration clause. Ms. Adams's action will be STAYED pending arbitration. Ms. Adams shall file a jointly prepared report regarding the status of arbitration proceedings on or before 11/17/2014, and every ninety (90) days thereafter, until this matter is resolved. It is further ORDERED that, as to the remaining forty-four Plaintiffs, there exists a genuine dispute as to the making of arbitration agreements. As to these forty-four Plaintiffs, a Bench Trial is set pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 4 on 9/16/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2B in Montgomery, AL before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to provide a court reporter for the bench trial. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/26/2014. Copies furnished to calendar group, AR. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers et al v. Groome Transportation of Alabama, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nettie Chambers
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie L. Adams
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Allmond
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makeda Barnes
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bartlett
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adolphus Billingslea
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie Brown
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Cannon
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Chappell, Jr.
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavelle Cox
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Cox
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Cruz
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dillard
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Eden
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Ferrell
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Finley
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Fredrick
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Greene
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Gunn
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Hart
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Heard
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Hinson
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danita Jackson
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Jones
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Kirk
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Lee
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Levi Lewis
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moore, Jr.
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dow Perry
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Randolph
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaTwanika Rhodes
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha D. Rocha
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Rogers
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Rowell
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Ruffin
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Smith
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Frank Smith
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Tate
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Thomas
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakecia Thomas
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keosha Traylor
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Vines
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Watson
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Yancey
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Young
Represented By: David A Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groome Transportation of Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold V. Groome, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold V. Groome, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Groome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?