United States of America v. Ninety Six Thousand Three Hundred Seventy ($96,370.00) Dollars in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ninety Six Thousand Three Hundred Seventy ($96,370.00) Dollars in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Arnold Grant
Case Number: 3:2014cv00356
Filed: May 15, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Montgomery
0 Judge: W. Harold Albritton
1 Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 23 Motion to Reconsider is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/12/2014. (dmn, )
October 15, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/15/2014. (dmn, )
August 29, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: (1) The Motion to Strike is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/29/2014. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ninety Six Thousand Three Hundred Seventy ($96,370.00) Dollars in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin P Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninety Six Thousand Three Hundred Seventy ($96,370.00) Dollars in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Arnold Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?