Madison v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Madison
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated September 1, 2004 Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-WHQ1
Case Number: 3:2018cv00678
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden. Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and alias summons signed by Kelly Webster for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC served on 8/20/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (dmn, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated September 1, 2004 Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-WHQ1. (dmn, )
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due from Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC on 10/3/2018; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 10/3/2018; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated September 1, 2004 Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-WHQ1 on 10/3/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/20/2018. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Edwards, Nicholas)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated September 1, 2004 Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-WHQ1. (Edwards, Nicholas)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated September 1, 2004 Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-WHQ1. (Edwards, Nicholas) Modified on 8/20/2018 to reflect proper event, wrong event selected when originally filed. (dmn, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 Alias Summons issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (dmn, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward." Counsel notified electronically by this docket entry. (dmn, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated September 1, 2004 Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-WHQ1, by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Unable to Forward." Counsel notified electronically by this docket entry. (dmn, ) Modified on 8/8/2018 to include additional text. (dmn, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued; summons, #1 complaint, and #2 conflict disclosure statement mailed CMRRR to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated September 1, 2004 Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-WHQ1. (dmn, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Crystal Madison. (dmn, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Crystal Madison. (dmn, )
July 20, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Crystal Madison. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 for pdf.)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated September 1, 2004 Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-WHQ1 ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050073.), filed by Crystal Madison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madison v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas P Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Nicholas P Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated September 1, 2004 Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-WHQ1
Represented By: Nicholas P Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Madison
Represented By: Charles M. Ingrum, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?