Marbury v. Schuster Enterprises, Inc.

Plaintiff: Gregory Marbury
Defendant: Schuster Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00722
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Opelika Office
County: Tallapoosa
0 Judge: Gray M Borden
1 Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/10/2018; DIRECTING counsel for the parties to complete and to send to the Clerk the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 10/10/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 9/19/2018. (alm, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Schuster Enterprises, Inc..(Lail, Patrick)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #11 and #12 Motions for Patrick Lee Lail and Philip L. Lu Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 9/12/18. (NO PDF Document attached to this notice). (djy, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 13 Received pro hac vice Filing fees re: #11 & #12 motions for attorneys Lail & Lu: $ 100.00, receipt number 4602050674. (djy, )
September 10, 2018 ***Attorney Patrick Lee Lail,Philip L. Lu for Schuster Enterprises, Inc. added pursuant to #11 & #12 motions to appear PHV (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Schuster Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Vreeland, Albert)
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Schuster Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Vreeland, Albert)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden. Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Schuster Enterprises, Inc.. (Vreeland, Albert)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement; Answer due from Schuster Enterprises, Inc. on 9/20/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/30/2018. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to US Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Schuster Enterprises, Inc.. (alm, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement by Schuster Enterprises, Inc.. (Vreeland, Albert)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by (illegible) for Schuster Enterprises, Inc. served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (djy, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Schuster Enterprises, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (alm, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to US Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Gregory Marbury. (alm, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gregory Marbury. (alm, )
August 9, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gregory Marbury. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (alm, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Schuster Enterprises, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602050278.), filed by Gregory Marbury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marbury v. Schuster Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schuster Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Albert Loring Vreeland, II
Represented By: Philip Luo Lu,
Represented By: Patrick Lee Lail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Marbury
Represented By: Allen Durham Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?