United States of America v. $3,960.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $3,960.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Antonio J Mitchell
Case Number: 3:2018cv00836
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by United States of America (Declaration of Publication) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Forfeiture and Advertisement Certification Report)(Neeley, Robert)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 CLAIM Verified Claim of Seized Assets by Antonio J Mitchell. (Hand, Benny)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Antonio J Mitchell.(Hand, Benny)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Warrant of Arrest IN REM, served on Dft Currency, c/o Atty Ben Hand, on 10/12/2018. (kh, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Warrant of Arrest IN REM, served on Dft Currency, c/o Antonio Mitchell c/o Atty Ben Hand, on 10/12/2018.(kh, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Warrant of Arrest IN REM, served on Dft Currency, c/o USMS, on 10/1/2018. (kh, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for United States of America (kh, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM issued and furnished to the USMS for service. (kh, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (kh, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $3,960.00 in United States Currency ( Filing fee $ 1 receipt number 1.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Personal Property, #2 Proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $3,960.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,960.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Antonio J Mitchell
Represented By: Benny Charles Hand, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?