Horton v. Hood et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Zyrell Horton
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall, Patricia Hood and Ray D. Martin
Case Number: 3:2018cv00886
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO #12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Zyrell Horton. (dmn, )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED that by December 6, 2018, Horton shall show cause why his 2254 petition should not be denied and this case dismissed as his petition was not filed within the one-year limitation period in 28 U.S.C. 2244(d). Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/16/2018. (kh, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 Supplemental Answer RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Patricia Hood, Steven T. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex-B-2 Transcript)(Saxon, Yvonne)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that on or before November 16, 2018, Respondents shall file a supplemental answer addressing whether Petitioner's 2254 petition is time- barred under the one-year federal limitation period in 28 U.S.C. 2244(d). See court's Order, Doc. #4 , at 23 (stating that "the respondents should make specific reference to 28 U.S.C. 2244(d)"), as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/7/2018. (kh, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Patricia Hood, Steven T. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX-A CCA Decision CR-06-1268, #2 Exhibit Ex-A-1 COJ, #3 Exhibit Ex-B CCA Decision CR-11-0046, #4 Exhibit Ex-B-1 CCA COJ CR-11-0046, #5 Exhibit Ex-C Case Action Summary, #6 Exhibit Ex-C-1 Horton' Rule 32 Petition, #7 Exhibit Ex-C-2 State's Response)(Saxon, Yvonne)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 complaint and #4 order of procedure signed by J. Taylor for Steven T. Marshall served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (kh, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne A. H. Saxon on behalf of Patricia Hood, Steven T. Marshall (Saxon, Yvonne)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patricia Hood, Steven T. Marshall. (Saxon, Yvonne)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 complaint and #4 order of procedure signed by Ina Beers for Patricia Hood served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (kh, )
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before November 7, 2018; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Patricia Hood & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/16/2018. (kh, )
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The petitioner's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/16/2018. (kh, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Zyrell Horton. (beh, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Zyrell Horton. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(beh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Hood et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Represented By: Yvonne A. H. Saxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Hood
Represented By: Yvonne A. H. Saxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zyrell Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?