Morrison v. Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carol Morrison
Defendant: Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc. and Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00904
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Young, Breanna)
December 19, 2018 Filing 18 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, )
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/4/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/17/2018. (wcl, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 16 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc., Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC.(Young, Breanna)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1) Plaintiff's #11 motion to withdraw her motion for entry of default is GRANTED; 2) Defendants' #8 motion for an extension of time to file an answer is GRANTED; counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before December 19, 2018, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form or reassignment into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/12/2018. (wcl, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Young, Breanna)
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Crowne Operations, Inc. re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Young, Breanna)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Crowne Investments, Inc. re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Young, Breanna)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw #7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Carol Morrison. (Rand, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2018: #1 Corrected Signature Pages) (wcl, ).
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc., Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc., Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC. (wcl, )
November 29, 2018 ***PURSUANT TO THE #8 MOTION - Attorney Arnold William Umbach, III for Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc., and Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, UNOPPOSED by Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc., Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC. (Young, Breanna)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 (WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #15 ORDER) MOTION for Entry of Default by Carol Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A - Affidavit of Paul H. Rand)(Rand, Paul) Modified on 12/12/2018 (wcl, ).
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Lori Chandler for: Crowne Investments, Inc. served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018; Crowne Operations, Inc. served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018; Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (wcl, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Carol Morrison re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Rand, Paul) Modified on 10/26/2018 to add the link to the #4 notice (wcl, ).
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Carol Morrison; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Carol Morrison. (wcl, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc., Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, )
October 22, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carol Morrison. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc., Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051114.), filed by Carol Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowne Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Arnold William Umbach, III
Represented By: Breanna Harris Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowne Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Arnold William Umbach, III
Represented By: Breanna Harris Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC
Represented By: Arnold William Umbach, III
Represented By: Breanna Harris Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Morrison
Represented By: Paul Hartmann Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?