Zapor v. Flandry et al
Plaintiff: Julia Zapor
Defendant: Fred Flandry and Jack Hughston Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 3:2018cv00954
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl C Williams on behalf of Fred Flandry, Jack Hughston Memorial Hospital (Williams, Carl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2018: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (wcl, ).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw #9 Notice of Appearance by Clay Tinney. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/11/2018. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John Clay Tinney on behalf of Julia Zapor (Tinney, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Correction re #10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, to attach a corrected PDF document to include Attorney Clay Tinney's original signature as said attorney is not registered to e-file. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry #10 )(wcl, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw #9 Notice (Other) Notice of Appearance by Clay Tinney by Julia Zapor. (Tinney, John)
November 19, 2018 ***PURSUANT TO THE #10 CONFLICT STATEMENT - Attorney John Clay Tinney for Julia Zapor added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Julia Zapor. (Tinney, John) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/20/2018) (wcl, ). Modified on 11/20/2018 to attach a corrected PDF document to include Attorney Clay Tinney's original signature as said attorney is not registered to e-file (wcl, ).
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 (WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S TEXT ORDER (DOC # 14))NOTICE by Julia Zapor Notice of Appearance by Clay Tinney (Tinney, John) Modified on 12/11/2018 (wcl, ).
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Fred Flandry. (Proctor, David)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jack Hughston Memorial Hospital. (Proctor, David)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by Fred Flandry, Jack Hughston Memorial Hospital re: filing of #1 Notice of Removal. (Proctor, David) Modified on 11/16/2018 to clarify the docket text and to add the link to the #1 notice (wcl, ).
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Substitute Exhibit "A" re #1 Notice of Removal by Fred Flandry, Jack Hughston Memorial Hospital. (Proctor, David) Modified on 11/16/2018 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES - Fred Flandry, Jack Hughston Memorial Hospital, Julia Zapor. (wcl, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jack Hughston Memorial Hospital. (wcl, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Fred Flandry. (wcl, )
November 8, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Julia Zapor. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
November 8, 2018 COMPLAINT against Fred Flandry, Jack Hughston Memorial Hospital, filed by Julia Zapor. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fred Flandry, Jack Hughston Memorial Hospital from Circuit Court of Russell County, AL, case number 57-cv-2018-900283.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051394) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zapor v. Flandry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Flandry
Represented By: David Wooten Proctor
Represented By: Richard Rhett Owens
Represented By: Carl C Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Hughston Memorial Hospital
Represented By: David Wooten Proctor
Represented By: Richard Rhett Owens
Represented By: Carl C Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Zapor
Represented By: John Alvin Tinney
Represented By: John Clay Tinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?