Freeman v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lakimblee Freeman
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Celtic Bank Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00984
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as presiding judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (wcl, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (wcl, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Reid, Kirkland)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Reid, Kirkland)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Jolee Henrid for Celtic Bank Corporation served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (wcl, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (wcl, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lakimblee Freeman re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (McDaniel, Reginald) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/3/2018) (wcl, ). Modified on 12/3/2018 to attach a properly published PDF document - no other changes were made (wcl, ).
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Celtic Bank Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Lakimblee Freeman; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment) (wcl, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Lakimblee Freeman. (wcl, )
November 26, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lakimblee Freeman. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celtic Bank Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051516.), filed by Lakimblee Freeman (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Kirkland Edward Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Bank Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakimblee Freeman
Represented By: Reginald Daryl McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?