Berry v. 2A USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: William C. Berry
Defendant: 2A USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01056
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 26(f) ORDER: ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than February 8, 2019. Additionally, the parties are hereby reminded that each has the right to consent or request reassignment. The parties should now confirm their consent in writing. See Rembert v. Apfel, 213 F.3d 1331 (11th Cir. 2000); Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2) (the parties are free to withhold consent without fear of adverse substantive consequences). Accordingly, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before February 1, 2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/17/2019. (kh, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for 2A USA, Inc. (kh, )
January 17, 2019 ***Attorney Sharonda Childs Fancher for 2A USA, Inc. added pursuant to the #6 answer. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by 2A USA, Inc..(Barlotta, Rachel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Laura McHaney for 2A USA, Inc. served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (djy, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 2A USA, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for William C. Berry (kh, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William C. Berry. (kh, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2A USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051801.), filed by William C. Berry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )
December 20, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William C. Berry. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. 2A USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Berry
Represented By: Kira Yalon Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2A USA, Inc.
Represented By: Sharonda Childs Fancher
Represented By: Rachel V. Barlotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?