Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. McBride Entertainment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sea Gayle Music LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Steve O'Brien Music, Spirit Music Group Inc., Eleksylum Music, Inc., Eldorotto Music Publishing, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Lucky Thumb Music, No Surrender Music, Groper Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Rhythm Wrangler Music, Big Gassed Hitties and Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Defendant: Skylar McBride, David McBride and McBride Entertainment, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00026
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This matter is before the court on plaintiffs notice of dismissal (Doc. #6 ) without prejudice, which is filed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). Upon consideration of the same, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/5/2019. (kh, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Pewitt, James)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to David McBride, Skylar McBride, McBride Entertainment, LLC.SPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, No Mail Receptacle, Unable to Forward. Counsel notified electronically of insufficient service via this docket entry. (kh, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to David McBride, Skylar McBride, McBride Entertainment, LLC. and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement.(kh, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Big Gassed Hitties, Bocephus Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Eldorotto Music Publishing, Eleksylum Music, Inc., Groper Music, Lucky Thumb Music, No Surrender Music, Noah's Little Boat Music, Rhythm Wrangler Music, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit Music Group Inc., Steve O'Brien Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (kh, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc.(kh, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David McBride, Skylar McBride, McBride Entertainment, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051987.), filed by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., No Surrender Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Bocephus Music, Inc., Eldorotto Music Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Lucky Thumb Music, Steve O'Brien Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Big Gassed Hitties, Eleksylum Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Rhythm Wrangler Music, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Sea Gayle Music LLC, Groper Music, Spirit Music Group Inc., Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Noah's Little Boat Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. McBride Entertainment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Gayle Music LLC
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve O'Brien Music
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spirit Music Group Inc.
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleksylum Music, Inc.
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldorotto Music Publishing
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music MGB NA LLC
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucky Thumb Music
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No Surrender Music
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Groper Music
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah's Little Boat Music
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bocephus Music, Inc.
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhythm Wrangler Music
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Gassed Hitties
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: James Price Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skylar McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McBride Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?