Haas v. Fancher

Appellant: Patrick Eldon Haas
Appellee: Deborah Kay Fancher
Case Number: 3:2019cv00097
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant's BRIEF by Patrick Eldon Haas. Appellee Brief due by 4/29/2019. (Ingrum, Charles)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Appellant's Second Amended Designation of Record on Appeal, which was filed with US Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Doc 58 - Appellant's Second Amended Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal, #2 Doc 1 - Complaint, #3 Doc 6 - Summons Executed on Fancer, #4 Doc 7 - Answer, #5 Doc 8 - Notice of Scheduling Conference, #6 Doc 9 - Certificate of Service, #7 Doc 10 - Scheduling Order, #8 Doc 12 - Motion Requesting Admissions Be Admitted, #9 Doc 13 - Notice of Telephone Hearing, #10 Doc 15 - Order, #11 Doc 17 - Submission of Pretrial Disclosures, #12 Doc 18 - Motion for Summary Judgment, #13 Doc 19 - Exhibit in Support of Summary Judgment, #14 Doc 22 - Motion to Reconsider, #15 Doc 25 - Notice of Telephone Hearing, #16 Doc 27 - Order, #17 Doc 28 - Briefing Schedule, #18 Doc 32 - Response in Opposition, #19 Doc 34 - Motion to Strike, #20 Doc 35 - Reply to Response in Opposition, #21 Doc 36 - Order, #22 Doc 37 - Scheduling Order,, #23 Doc 40 - Submission of Exhibit/Witness Lists, #24 Doc 41 - Submission of Pretrial Disclosures, #25 Doc 42 - Pretrial Brief, #26 Doc 43 - Objection to Exhibit List, #27 Doc 48 - Order, #28 Doc 50 - Rule 7058 Judgment, #29 Doc 52 - Notice of Appeal, #30 Transcript of 10/23/2017 Proceedings, #31 Transcript of 1/22/2018 Proceedings, #32 Transcript of 5/15/2018 Proceedings, #33 Transcript of 12/10/2018 Proceedings, #34 Transcript of 1/17/2019 Proceedings, #35 Certified Docket Sheet - Adv Proc 17-08019)(wcl, )
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Continue the Deadline and Appellant may file his brief within 30 days of receiving the transcripts he requested in his designation of the record; Appellee's brief is due no later than 30 days after service of Appellant's brief, and Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days after service of Appellee's brief. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/28/2019. (wcl, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Continue Brief of Appellant by Patrick Eldon Haas. (Ingrum, Charles)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patrick Eldon Haas. (Ingrum, Charles)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Appellant's Amended Designation of Record on Appeal, which was filed with US Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Doc 56 - Appellant's Amended Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal, #2 Doc 1 - Complaint, #3 Doc 6 - Summons Executed on Fancer, #4 Doc 7 - Answer, #5 Doc 8 - Notice of Scheduling Conference, #6 Doc 9 - Certificate of Service, #7 Doc 10 - Scheduling Order, #8 Doc 12 - Motion Requesting Admissions Be Admitted, #9 Doc 13 - Notice of Telephone Hearing, #10 Doc 15 - Order, #11 Doc 17 - Submission of Pretrial Disclosures, #12 Doc 18 - Motion for Summary Judgment, #13 Doc 19 - Exhibit in Support of Summary Judgment, #14 Doc 22 - Motion to Reconsider, #15 Doc 25 - Notice of Telephone Hearing, #16 Doc 27 - Order, #17 Doc 28 - Briefing Schedule, #18 Doc 32 - Response in Opposition, #19 Doc 34 - Motion to Strike, #20 Doc 35 - Reply to Response in Opposition, #21 Doc 36 - Order, #22 Doc 37 - Scheduling Order, #23 Doc 40 - Submission of Exhibit/Witness Lists, #24 Doc 41 - Submission of Pretrial Disclosures, #25 Doc 42 - Pretrial Brief, #26 Doc 43 - Objection to Exhibit List, #27 Doc 48 - Order, #28 Doc 50 - Rule 7058 Judgment, #29 Doc 52 - Notice of Appeal, #30 Certified Docket Sheet - Adv Proc 17-08019)(kr, ) Modified on 3/6/2019 to clarify the docket text to reflect as an "Amended" Designation (wcl, ).
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Clerk's TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT; Bankruptcy Court Adversary Proceeding No. 17-8019-WRS; Appellant Brief due by 3/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 USBC Notice of Appeal, #2 USBC Order Granting Motion to Reconsider, #3 USBC Order Denying Motions, #4 USBC Rule 7058 Judgment, #5 USBC Certified Docket Sheet)(kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haas v. Fancher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Patrick Eldon Haas
Represented By: Charles M. Ingrum, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deborah Kay Fancher
Represented By: Jeffrey Clarke Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?