Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. v. IVM Solutions, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Corey Craig, IVM Solutions, L.L.C. and Adrienne Craig
Case Number: 3:2019cv00138
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to IVM Solutions, L.L.C., Adrienne Craig, & Corey Craig; copies mailed to Dfts. (alm, )
April 9, 2019 Copy of #8 Application and Case File delivered to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. against IVM Solutions, L.L.C. d/b/a Roadside, Inc., Adrienne Craig and Corey Craig, individually. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Patrick L.W. Sefton)(Sefton, Patrick)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Enrika Harris for IVM Solutions, L.L.C. served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (alm, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Corey Craig for Corey Craig served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (dmn, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Corey Craig for Adrienne Craig served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (dmn, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Adrienne Craig, Corey Craig, IVM Solutions, L.L.C. (dmn, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. (dmn, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. (dmn, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adrienne Craig, Corey Craig, IVM Solutions, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052453.), filed by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Promissory Note, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. v. IVM Solutions, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVM Solutions, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrienne Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Ladd Wheeler Sefton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?