Hooks v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jarmal Hooks and Jarmel Hooks
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC and Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00158
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the FRCP 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/18/2019. (alm, )
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Brenda S. Fulmer, Katherine Anne Kiziah, and C. Calvin Warriner, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice; All counsel shall file a notice of appearance with the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/2/2019. (alm, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Correction re #71 Order, to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the date the Order was signed as 3/21/2019 & not 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #71 )(alm, )
March 21, 2019 PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #71 ORDER - ***Attorney Erin Linder Hanig, John D. LaDue, Stephanie N. Russo, J. Joseph Tanner, Adrienne Franco Busby, & Andrew L. Campbell terminated. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER construing the #68 Notice as a Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; ORDER granting #68 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 3/21/2019. (alm, ) (Main Document 71 replaced on 3/22/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the date the Order was signed as 3/21/2019 & not 3/22/2019) (alm, ). Modified on 3/22/2019 (alm, ).
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Erica K. Drew to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 3/21/2019. (alm, )
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Matthew T. Albaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 3/21/2019. (alm, )
March 18, 2019 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., as CONSTRUED in the Court's #71 Order. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #68 for pdf) (alm, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. Regarding Defendants' MDL Counsel (Mathis, Alan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Deficiency Regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission for Katherine A. Kiziah. (alm, ) (alm, ). Modified on 3/18/2019 to attach the pdf document which was originally omitted in error (alm, ).
March 18, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Deficiency Regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission for C. Calvin Warriner, III. (alm, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Deficiency Regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission for Brenda S. Fulmer. (alm, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Deficiency Regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission for J. Joseph Tanner. (alm, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Deficiency Regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission for Stephanie N. Russo. (alm, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Deficiency Regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission for John D. LaDue. (alm, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Deficiency Regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission for Erin Linder Hanig. (alm, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Deficiency Regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission for Andrew L. Campbell. (alm, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Deficiency Regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission for Adrienne Franco Busby. (alm, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for Brenda S. Fulmer, Katherine Anne Kiziah, and C. Calvin Warriner, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice re #64 , #65 , & #66 NOTICE of Deficiency Regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission (Filing fee $ 150.00, receipt number 4602052843) by Jarmel Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (Fulmer), #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing (Kiziah), #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing (Warriner, III)), #4 Receipt)(alm, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 57 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re #53 Motion for Erica K. Drew to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602052818. (alm, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 56 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re #52 Motion for Matthew T. Albaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602052817. (alm, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 55 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. re #51 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 3/15/2019 to add the link to the #51 Notice (alm, ).
March 13, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Correction re #52 Motion for Matthew T. Albaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice & #53 Motion for Erica K. Drew to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to attach certificates of good standing which were erroneously omitted from the docket entries when e-filed. (Attachments: #1 PDF of Document #52 , #2 PDF of Document #53 )(alm, )
March 12, 2019 PURSUANT TO THE #52 & #53 MOTIONS - ***Attorneys Matthew T. Albaugh & Erica K. Drew for Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, & Biomet, Inc. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 53 Motion for Erica K. Drew to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc.. (Mathis, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2019 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the E-government rules: #1 Main PDF Document (Redacted)) (alm, ). Modified on 3/13/2019 (alm, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2019: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (alm, ).
March 12, 2019 Filing 52 Motion for Matthew T. Albaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc.. (Mathis, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2019 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the E-government rules: #1 Main PDF Document (Redacted)) (alm, ). Modified on 3/13/2019 (alm, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2019: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (alm, ).
March 11, 2019 Filing 51 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Biomet, Inc., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, & Biomet Manufacturing, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Xan Peyton Ingram on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Ingram, Xan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Daniel Mathis on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Mathis, Alan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 48 Case transferred in from the Northern District of Indiana; Case Number 3:17-cv-00743-RLM-MGG; Original file, certified copy of transfer order, & certified docket sheet received via EMAIL from the Clerk.(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooks v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: John D. LaDue
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Albaugh
Represented By: J. Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Alan Daniel Mathis
Represented By: Andrew L. Campbell
Represented By: Stephanie N. Russo
Represented By: Xan Peyton Ingram
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Erica Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet, Inc.
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: John D. LaDue
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Albaugh
Represented By: J. Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Alan Daniel Mathis
Represented By: Andrew L. Campbell
Represented By: Stephanie N. Russo
Represented By: Xan Peyton Ingram
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Erica Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: John D. LaDue
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Albaugh
Represented By: Alan Daniel Mathis
Represented By: Xan Peyton Ingram
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Erica Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Represented By: John D. LaDue
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Albaugh
Represented By: Alan Daniel Mathis
Represented By: Xan Peyton Ingram
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Erica Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarmal Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarmel Hooks
Represented By: Brenda S Fulmer
Represented By: Katherine A Kiziah
Represented By: Clell Calvin Warriner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?