United States of America v. $51,660.73 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $51,660.73 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2019cv00233
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Before the court is the United States' #5 Motion for Leave to Dismiss Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem. The motion is construed as a notice of voluntary dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the FRCP. Because the notice comports with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plf's action against Def has been dismissed without prejudice by operation of Rule 41(a)(1). The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this action. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cnw, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Dismiss Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(cnw, ) construed as a notice of voluntary dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on 7/11/2019 pursuant to the Court's #6 Order (cnw, ).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal Verified Complaint for forfeiture in rem. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/17/19. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (djy, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal verified complaint for forfeiture in rem by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(djy, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 ***SEALED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $51,660.73 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 proposed warrant, #2 civil cover sheet)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $51,660.73 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $51,660.73 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?