Charles v. Builders Professional Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Megan Charles
Defendant: Builders Professional Group, LLC, Knight Builders, Knight Homes and Amelia Highway 41, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00261
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support OF A DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Megan Charles. (Alsobrook, Zachary)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Amelia Highway 41, LLC, Builders Professional Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kee, James)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED on or before June 13, 2019, the parties shall file briefs on the issue of whether this matter should be dismissed with or without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/30/2019. (kh, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Accordingly, any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before May 23, 2019. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/16/2019. (kh, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Megan Charles. (Alsobrook, Zachary)
April 30, 2019 *** Attorney Lucy Westover Jordan terminated pursuant to the 8 text order. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Lucy W. Jordan to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/30/2019. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
April 30, 2019 MOTION for Lucy W. Jordan to Withdraw as Attorney by Builders Professional Group, LLC. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #7 for pdf. Attorney used the incorrect event code.)(kh, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Builders Professional Group, LLC and Amelia Highway 41, LLC of Withdrawal of Lucy W. Jordan (Jordan, Lucy) Modified on 4/30/2019 to add as filed on behalf of additional parties. (kh, ).
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Megan Charles. (Alsobrook, Zachary)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Amelia Highway 41, LLC, Builders Professional Group, LLC. (Jordan, Lucy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amelia Highway 41, LLC. (Kee, James)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Builders Professional Group, LLC. (Kee, James)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Amelia Highway 41, LLC, Builders Professional Group, LLC, Megan Charles (kh, )
April 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Megan Charles. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 10, 2019 COMPLAINT against Amelia Highway 41, LLC, Builders Professional Group, LLC, filed by Megan Charles.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amelia Highway 41, LLC, Builders Professional Group, LLC from Circuit Court of Lee County, Alabama, case number 43-CV-2019-900076.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053188) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. Builders Professional Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Builders Professional Group, LLC
Represented By: James Alfred Kee, Jr.
Represented By: Lucy Westover Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Builders
Represented By: James Alfred Kee, Jr.
Represented By: Lucy Westover Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Homes
Represented By: James Alfred Kee, Jr.
Represented By: Lucy Westover Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelia Highway 41, LLC
Represented By: James Alfred Kee, Jr.
Represented By: Lucy Westover Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Charles
Represented By: Zachary D Alsobrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?