Lindsey v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Lindsey
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc. and Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00278
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1453
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Case transferred to the District of Maryland. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 Received certified copy of transfer order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Maryland. (alm, )
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Marybeth V. Gibson to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Counsel shall file a notice of appearance with the court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/3/2019. (alm, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re #5 Motion for Marybeth V. Gibson to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602053380. (alm, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Laura McHaney for Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (alm, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Laura McHaney for Marriott International, Inc. served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (alm, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Parrish, Jimmy)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc.. (Parrish, Jimmy)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmy Dale Parrish on behalf of Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC (Parrish, Jimmy) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/29/2019 to attach a properly published PDF) (alm, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2019: #1 Certificate of Service) (alm, ). Modified on 4/29/2019 (alm, ).
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Marybeth V. Gibson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles Lindsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing for MaryBeth V. Gibson)(Finley, James)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Charles Lindsey re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Finley, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marriott International, Inc. & Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (alm, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Charles Lindsey; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
April 17, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Charles Lindsey. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (alm, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602053272), filed by Charles Lindsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Jimmy Dale Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Jimmy Dale Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lindsey
Represented By: Marybeth V. Gibson
Represented By: James Benjamin Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?