Hinton v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Stanley Jawan Hinton
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00286
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT by Donnie Wayne Bethel. (Bethel, Donnie)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION OF BRANDON A. THOMAS re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Brandon A. Thomas. (kh, )
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that this #3 motion be and is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the government be GRANTED an extension from May 28, 2019, to and including July 26, 2019, to file a response addressing the claims presented by the petitioner in his 2255 motion. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/8/2019. (kh, )
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by United States of America. (Bates, Brandon)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the clerk to serve a copy of Hinton's 2255 motion upon the United States Attorney for the Middle District of Alabama. The United States Attorney is ORDERED to file a response to Hinton's 2255 motion on or before May 28, 2019 as further set out in order; directing the clerk to provide copies of this order and the 2255 motion to attorneys Donnie W. Bethel and Brandon A. Thomas. ORDERED that on or before May 17, 2019, Mr. Bethel and Mr. Thomas shall file with this court an affidavit that addresses any claims of ineffective assistance of counsel presented against him in the 2255 motion. Mr. Bethel and Mr. Thomas shall also furnish the United States Attorney and Mr. Hinton with copies of their affidavit. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/25/2019. (Electronic notice sent to US Attorney and Donnie Bethel and Brandon Thomas)(kh, )
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Stanley Jawan Hinton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Criminal Docket Sheet, #3 Criminal Judgment)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinton v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Jawan Hinton
Represented By: Douglas Harry Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: John J Geer, III
Represented By: Brandon Wade Bates
Represented By: Kevin P Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?