Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co. v. Fetty et al
Plaintiff: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co.
Defendant: Carl Morgan and Jason Fetty
Case Number: 3:2019cv00316
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as presiding Judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (cnw, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 Alias Summons issued as to Jason Fetty and return to counsel for personal service. (kh, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Jason Fetty; counsel is notified via this notice regarding un-perfected service. (wcl, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co.. (Franklin, Patrick)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Motion to Stay (Doc. #3 ) is due to be and is hereby ORDERED DENIED without prejudice to being refiled as a later date, if appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 5/14/2019. (kh, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by C. Morgan for Carl Morgan served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (kh, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jason Fetty, Carl Morgan and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co.. (Franklin, Patrick)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co. (kh, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason Fetty, Carl Morgan ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053441.), filed by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co. v. Fetty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Fetty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: Patrick W. Franklin
Represented By: Paul Albert Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?