Sanders v. Seavers
Plaintiff: Pochya Dee Sanders
Defendant: Michael Damon Seavers
Case Number: 3:2019cv00353
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: On 7/3/2019, the parties filed a #8 joint stipulation of dismissal; Upon consideration of the joint stipulation of dismissal, and for good cause, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this case be and is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs; It is further ORDERED that all pending deadlines are terminated and all pending motions are hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cnw, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal by Michael Damon Seavers, Pochya Dee Sanders. (McKoon, James) Modified on 7/3/2019 to reflect as also filed on behalf of plaintiff (kr, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kr, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/28/2019; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 6/28/2019, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form or reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/7/2019. (kr, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Michael Damon Seavers. (Gamble, Glenn) Modified on 5/23/2019 to clarify text to reflect as satisfying #3 notice of deficiency (cnw, ).
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and #1 Amended Complaint, by Michael Damon Seavers.(Gamble, Glenn) Modified on 5/23/2019 to clarify docket text and add link(cnw, ).
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Michael Damon Seavers; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (ALL PARTIES) Pochya Dee Sanders, Michael Damon Seavers. (cnw, )
May 16, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Pochya Dee Sanders. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
May 16, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Damon Seavers, filed by Pochya Dee Sanders. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cnw, )
May 16, 2019 COMPLAINT against Michael Damon Seavers, filed by Pochya Dee Sanders. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cnw, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Damon Seavers from Circuit Court of Russell County, case number 57-cv-19-900116. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053590) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 receipt) (cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Seavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pochya Dee Sanders
Represented By: Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth Jay Shinbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Damon Seavers
Represented By: James P. Graham, Jr.
Represented By: James Robert McKoon, Jr.
Represented By: Glenn Channing Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?