Edwards v. Harrington et al (CONSENT)

Plaintiff: Yolanda R. Edwards
Defendant: Valley Wood, Inc. and Bobby Ray Harrington
Case Number: 3:2019cv00423
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McKoon, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #1 Corrected Signature Page) (cnw, ).
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by Counsel for Yolanda R. Edwards. (cnw, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge E-signed by Counsel for Bobby Ray Harrington, Valley Wood, Inc. (cnw, )
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/8/2019; counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 8/5/2019, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the reassignment form nor reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/29/2019. (cnw, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for LaRae D. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/9/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bobby Ray Harrington re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Gibson, Austin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Valley Wood, Inc. re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Gibson, Austin)
June 25, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 Motion - Attorney Larae D. Moore for Bobby Ray Harrington, Valley Wood, Inc. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for LaRae D. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602054016.) by Bobby Ray Harrington, Valley Wood, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order, #4 receipt)(cnw, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plf) Yolanda R. Edwards. (cnw, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Yolanda R. Edwards. (McKoon, James)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James Robert McKoon, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McKoon, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defs) Bobby Ray Harrington, Valley Wood, Inc. (cnw, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Bobby Ray Harrington individually doing business as Timberline Wood Products and Valley Wood, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
June 17, 2019 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Bobby Ray Harrington, Valley Wood, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
June 17, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bobby Ray Harrington, Valley Wood, Inc. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
June 17, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by Bobby Ray Harrington, Valley Wood, Inc. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cnw, )
June 17, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Yolanda R. Edwards. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
June 17, 2019 COMPLAINT against Bobby Ray Harrington, Valley Wood, Inc., filed by Yolanda R. Edwards. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf(cnw, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bobby Ray Harrington, Valley Wood, Inc. from Circuit Court of Russell County, case number 57-cv-19-900133. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053937) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D- State Court Record, #5 State Court Answer, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 receipt) (cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Harrington et al (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Wood, Inc.
Represented By: Austin Steele Gibson
Represented By: Larae D. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Ray Harrington
Represented By: Austin Steele Gibson
Represented By: Larae D. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda R. Edwards
Represented By: Jennifer Dunn Batson Cooley
Represented By: Richard L Chancey
Represented By: James Robert McKoon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?