Dean et al v. Colonial Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: A. B. Dean, III and Theresa Smith Dean
Defendant: Colonial Bank, National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Fay Servicing, LLC and CitiGroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2017-RP2
Case Number: 3:2019cv00502
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
September 12, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to Mag Judge Doyle, case reassigned: #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (djy, )
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 9/10/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/3/2019. (alm, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Fay Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Pittman, Timothy)
August 19, 2019 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 Motion to Dismiss. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #10 for PDF) (alm, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 (RESPONSE to Motion re #8 Motion to Dismiss) Counter MOTION to Dismiss by A. B. Dean, III, Theresa Smith Dean. (Williams, J.) Modified on 8/19/2019 to clarify the docket text & add the link to the #8 Motion (alm, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019 to redact personal information contained in the original filing pursuant to the E-government rules: #1 Main PDF Document (Redacted)) (alm, ). Modified on 8/20/2019 (alm, ).
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Plf, if any there be, as to why the #8 Motion to Dismiss should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 8/23/2019; Dfts may reply on or before 8/30/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/16/2019. (wcl, )
August 12, 2019 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Fay Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #8 -1 for pdf) (wcl, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Fay Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Pittman, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Fay Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Pittman, Timothy)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by A. B. Dean, III, Theresa Smith Dean. (Williams, J.) Modified on 7/24/2019 to remove the erroneous link to the #3 Notice (alm, ).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadline; Dfts Fay Servicing LLC and Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB may file an answer or present other defenses on or before 8/12/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/23/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss by Fay Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, A.B. Dean, III, Theresa Smith Dean. (Beckett, Amanda) Modified on 7/22/2019 to add as also filed on behalf of the Plfs (alm, ).
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Fay Servicing, LLC & Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for A. B. Dean, III, Theresa Smith Dean, Fay Servicing, LLC, & Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (alm, )
July 15, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by A. B. Dean, III, Theresa Smith Dean. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for PDF) (alm, )
July 15, 2019 COMPLAINT against CitiGroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2017-RP2, Colonial Bank, National Association, Fay Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, filed by A. B. Dean, III, Theresa Smith Dean. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for PDF)(alm, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fay Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB from Circuit Court of Lee County, AL, case number 43-CV-2019-900338.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602054251) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean et al v. Colonial Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. B. Dean, III
Represented By: J. Michael Williams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Smith Dean
Represented By: J. Michael Williams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Timothy Paul Pittman
Represented By: Amanda McGregor Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Paul Pittman
Represented By: Amanda McGregor Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2017-RP2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?