Sankey v. Wilkie (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Sharesta K. Sankey
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Case Number: 3:2019cv00525
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DIRECTING the Clerk to defer service of process on the dft until further order of the court, following the court's 1915(e) review of the plf's complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/23/2019. (alm, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, this case is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate; Plf's motion is REFERRED to the magistrate judge assigned to this case. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 8/15/19. (djy, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMATION of the pro se party by Sharesta K. Sankey. (djy, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of the pro se party by Sharesta K. Sankey. (djy, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sharesta K. Sankey. (djy, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sharesta K. Sankey. (Attachments: #1 application to proceed)(djy, )
July 24, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sharesta K. Sankey. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Wilkie, filed by Sharesta K. Sankey. (Attachments: #1 supporting document)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sankey v. Wilkie (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharesta K. Sankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?