Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Reyes 1, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: Reyes 1, Inc. and Michael Jason Harmon
Case Number: 3:2019cv00549
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 #7 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default with file hand delivered to Clerk, Debra P. Hackett. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
September 18, 2019 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Branch Banking and Trust Company against Reyes 1, Inc. and Michael Jason Harmon. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #7 for pdf. Wrong event code selected when originally filed.)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default /Application for Entry of Default by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Cathleen C. Moore in Support of Application to Clerk for Entry of Default)(Moore, Cathleen)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. Michael Jason Harmon served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Moore, Cathleen)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. Reyes 1, Inc. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Moore, Cathleen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Moore, Cathleen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael Jason Harmon, Reyes 1, Inc. and returned to counsel for personal service. (kh, ) Modified on 8/9/2019 to clarify the text. (kh, ).
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Branch Banking and Trust Company (kh, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Jason Harmon, Reyes 1, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054395.), filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C1, #4 Exhibit C2, #5 Exhibit D1, #6 Exhibit D2, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Text of Proposed Order, #15 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Reyes 1, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Cathleen Curran Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reyes 1, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jason Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?