Collum v. East Alabama Medical Center
Appellant: Andrew Collum and Andrew M. Collum
Appellee: East Alabama Medical Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv00558
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re #5 Notice. (amf, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Andrew M. Collum (Bush, Anthony)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by Andrew M. Collum. (Bush, Anthony)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Appellee's Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal which was filed with the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal, #2 Transcript of Telephonic Hearing on 6/11/2019, #3 Certified Docket Sheet - AP # 18-08011)(alm, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Appellant's Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal which was filed with the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Items to be Included in the Record and Statement of Issues on Appeal, #2 Doc 1 - Complaint, #3 Doc 5 - Notice of Status Hearing, #4 Doc 7 - Notice of Appearance, #5 Doc 8 - Notice of Appearance, #6 Text Entries, #7 Doc 9 - Answer to Complaint, #8 Doc 10 - Scheduling Order, #9 Doc 12 - Motion for Summary Judgment, #10 Doc 13 - Order on Motion to Set Hearing, #11 Doc 15 - Response, #12 Doc 16 - Motion to Strike, #13 Doc 17 - Response, #14 Doc 18 - Order on Motion to Set Hearing, #15 Doc 21 - Plaintiff's Pretrial Disclosures, #16 Doc 22 - Motion to Extend Time, #17 Doc 23 - Order Vacating Scheduling Order, #18 Doc 25 - Memorandum Decision, #19 Doc 26 - Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #20 Doc 29 - Notice of Appeal, #21 Certified Docket Sheet - AP 18-08011)(alm, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Clerk's TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT; Bankruptcy Court Adversary Proceeding No. 18-08011; Appellant Brief due by 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Memorandum Decision, #3 Order, #4 Certified Docket Sheet)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collum v. East Alabama Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Andrew Collum
Represented By: Anthony Brian Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Andrew M. Collum
Represented By: Anthony Brian Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: East Alabama Medical Center
Represented By: Derek Firth Meek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?