Drake v. Jones
Plaintiff: Kwesi Drake
Defendant: Jay Jones
Case Number: 3:2019cv00579
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hill, Charles)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/4/2019. Any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 10/4/2019 as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/6/2019. (dmn, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kwesi Drake. (Finney, Tanika)
September 5, 2019 ***Attorney Ashley Hawkins Freeman for Jay Jones added pursuant to the #5 answer. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jay Jones. (Hill, Charles)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Jay Jones (kh, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Jay Jones.(Hill, Charles)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Kwesi Drake. (dmn, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kwesi Drake. Jay Jones served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (dmn, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jay Jones and returned to counsel for personal service. (dmn, )
August 12, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kwesi Drake. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 .)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jay Jones ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054575.), filed by Kwesi Drake. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drake v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwesi Drake
Represented By: Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.
Represented By: Tanika Larosa Lakes Finney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Jones
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?