Stokes v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Bradley Wayne Stokes
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00634
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT, in accordance with the memorandum opinion enteredtoday, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of thecourt: (1) petitioner's #3 objection is overruled; (2) adopting #2 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; (3) the #1 petition for writ of habeas corpus is dismissed without prejudice because the required permission has not been obtained from the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals; no costs are taxed; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/4/19. (Attachments: #1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/4/19. (djy, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Response to #2 RECOMMENDATION filed by Bradley Wayne Stokes by Bradley Wayne Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(am, )
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that the 2255 motion be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction, as Stokes has failed to obtain the requisite order from the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals authorizing this court to consider a successive 2255 motion; Objections to R&R due by 9/20/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/6/2019. (am, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Bradley Wayne Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2 Redacted, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4 Redacted, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Criminal Judgment, #9 Criminal Docket Sheet)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew W. Shepherd
Represented By: Monica Anne Stump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Wayne Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?