Thomas v. Schuster Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Terrance D. Thomas
Defendant: Schuster Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00648
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/13/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/23/2019. (kr, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Schuster Enterprises, Inc. re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Kanter, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/17/2019 to add the link to the #2 Notice (amf, ).
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Schuster Enterprises, Inc..(Allison, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Schuster Enterprises, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(kr, )
September 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Terrance D. Thomas. (No pdf attached to this entry - See docket entry #1 for pdf) (kr, )
September 6, 2019 COMPLAINT against Schuster Enterprises, Inc., filed by Terrance D. Thomas. (No pdf attached to this entry - See docket entry #1 for pdf)(kr, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Schuster Enterprises, Inc. from Circuit Court of Chambers County, Alabama, case number 12-cv-2019-9000102.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054823)(Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B Part 1, #4 Exhibit B Part 2, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt)(kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Schuster Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schuster Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Kanter
Represented By: Russell Q. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance D. Thomas
Represented By: Travis Gary McKay, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Moak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?