Hughley v. USAA General Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Quenton Hughley
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00681
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Pattillo, James)
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT Quenton Hughley against USAA General Indemnity Company, filed by Quenton Hughley.(Luck, Aaron)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Doc. #14 is granted. Plaintiff shall filed amended complaint forthwith. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 11/13/2019. (no pdf document attached this entry)(kh, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pattillo, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Original Complaint by Quenton Hughley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Luck, Aaron)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER denying #12 Motion to Amend/Correct the Original Complaint for failure to comply with local rule that requires a proposed amended complaint to be filed as exhibit to motion. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 11/1/2019. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, ) Modified on 11/1/2019 to clarify the text. (kh, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Original Complaint by Quenton Hughley. (Luck, Aaron)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 26(f) ORDER: ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than November 13, 2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/23/2019. (kh, )
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Remand, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/23/2019. (kh, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Pattillo, James)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Quenton Hughley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Luck, Aaron)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that, on or before October 15, 2019, Defendant shall show cause why the #5 motion should not be granted. Previously, the parties were notified of the assignment of this case to a Magistrate Judge and the right to consent or request reassignment. See Attached Explanation. Therefore, as indicated in the notice of assignment, the parties should now confirm their decision in writing. Accordingly, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and send to the Clerk of the Court the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before October 15, 2019. DO NOT FILE THE FORM ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/30/2019. (kh, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Quenton Hughley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A.Letter)(Luck, Aaron)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Quenton Hughley. (Luck, Aaron)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Quenton Hughley, USAA General Indemnity Company (kh, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Pattillo, James)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA General Indemnity Company (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
September 16, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by USAA General Indemnity Company.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
September 16, 2019 COMPLAINT against USAA General Indemnity Company, filed by Quenton Hughley.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA General Indemnity Company from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 46-CV-2019-900118.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054937) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - USAA Answer, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughley v. USAA General Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quenton Hughley
Represented By: Aaron John Luck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: James Laurens Pattillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?