Nemeth v. Auburn University et al
Plaintiff: Alexa R. Nemeth
Defendant: Steven Leath, Clinton Myers, Corey Myers, Auburn University and Jay Gogue
Case Number: 3:2019cv00715
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 26 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (am, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of filing under seal by Auburn University, Jay Gogue re #20 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Sealed), #2 Exhibit 2 (Sealed))(djy, )
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER directing plf TO SHOW CAUSE as to why #20 , #21 , and #22 Motions to Dismiss should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 11/27/2019; defs may file replies on or before 12/4/2019; directing counsel for the parties, on or before 12/4/2019, to confirm consent electronically or to complete and send the appropriate attached for to the clerk. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/13/19. (djy, )
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File exhibits to motion to dismiss under seal. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/13/19. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
November 12, 2019 ***Attorney Jaime Stone Hammer,Melissa Maran White for Auburn University and Jay Gogue added pursuant to {19] motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Steven Leath. (Connally, Joel)
November 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Clinton Myers, Corey Myers. (Oliver, Blake)
November 11, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Auburn University, Jay Gogue. (Pate, Kelly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2019 to attach sealed exhibits: #1 Exhibit 1 (Sealed), #2 Exhibit 2 (Sealed)) (qc/djy, ).
November 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File to File Exhibits to Motion to Dismiss Under Seal by Auburn University, Jay Gogue. (Pate, Kelly)
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Davidson Connally on behalf of Steven Leath (Connally, Joel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Lee Oliver on behalf of Corey Myers (Oliver, Blake)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 MOTION to Establish Uniform Date for Initial Responses; all defs shall have until on or before 11/12/2019 to file their responsive pleading. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/4/19. (djy, )
November 1, 2019 ***Attorney Blake Lee Oliver for Corey Myers added pursuant to #15 motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION Establish Uniform Date for Initial Responses by Auburn University, Jay Gogue. (Pate, Kelly) Modified on 11/4/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of Corey Myers & Clinton Myers (qc/djy, ).
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Steven Leath for Steven Leath, served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (amf, )
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting defs' #9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/21/19. (djy, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Clinton Myers. (Oliver, Blake) (Main Document 12 replaced on 10/21/2019) (djy, ).
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Lee Oliver on behalf of Clinton Myers (Oliver, Blake)
October 18, 2019 ***Attorney David Randall Boyd for Auburn University,David Randall Boyd for Jay Gogue added pursuant to #9 motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Auburn University, Jay Gogue. (Pate, Kelly)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Auburn University, Jay Gogue. (Pate, Kelly) Modified on 10/21/2019 to clarify text to reflect as filed also on behalf of Clinton Myers (qc/djy, ).
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by K L Meyers for Clinton Myers served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (djy, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Jose Montanez for Auburn University served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (djy, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Jose Montanez for Jay Gogue served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (djy, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alexa R. Nemeth re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Saxon, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Auburn University, Jay Gogue, Steven Leath, Clinton Myers, & Corey Myers; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Alexa R. Nemeth; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Alexa R. Nemeth. (amf, )
September 25, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alexa R. Nemeth. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Auburn University, Jay Gogue, Steven Leath, Clinton Myers, Corey Myers (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602055037), filed by Alexa R. Nemeth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nemeth v. Auburn University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexa R. Nemeth
Represented By: John David Saxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Leath
Represented By: Joel Davidson Connally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Myers
Represented By: Blake Lee Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Myers
Represented By: Blake Lee Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auburn University
Represented By: Melissa Maran White
Represented By: Jaime Stone Hammer
Represented By: Kelly Fitzgerald Pate
Represented By: David Randall Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Gogue
Represented By: Melissa Maran White
Represented By: Jaime Stone Hammer
Represented By: Kelly Fitzgerald Pate
Represented By: David Randall Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?