Meyers v. Saul (CONSENT)
Plaintiff: Maxine Meyers
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00835
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by (plaintiff) Maxine Meyers. (djy, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by (defendant) Andrew Saul. (djy, )
November 20, 2019 ***Attorney James Joseph DuBois for Andrew Saul added pursuant to #9 consent (No PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and order of procedure signed by Niarchos Wright on 11/4/2019 for SSA Office or Regional Counsel. (djy, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and order of procedure signed by Emily Sase on 11/5/2019 for Attorney General of the US. (djy, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and order of procedure signed by (no signature) on 11/4/2019 for Andrew Saul. (djy, ) Modified on 11/13/2019 to clarify text to include order of procedure not disclosure statement (qc/djy, ).
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #3 Order signed by Lawrence B. for US Attorney's Office served on 11/1/2019, answer due 1/30/2020 for Andrew Saul. (wcl, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, Social Security Office of Regional Counsel, and U.S. Attorney General and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint and #3 order. (djy, )
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; ORDER TO ANSWER Social Security Complaint within 90 days after the date of service of the complaint; plaintiff to file brief in support within 40 days of filing of the answer; defendant's reply brief and administrative record due within 30 days of brief filing. Copies mailed to counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/31/19. (djy, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maxine Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(es, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Maxine Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyers v. Saul (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Meyers
Represented By: Brian Roy Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?