KEPRO Acquisitions, Inc. v. Analytics Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: KEPRO Acquisitions, Inc.
Defendant: Guy R. Dibenedetto, Jr., Analytics Holdings, LLC and HDI Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00842
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: GRANTING the #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply; Reply brief is due on 1/10/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 12/23/2019. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Analytics Holdings, LLC, Guy R. Dibenedetto, Jr, HDI Solutions, LLC. (Grayson, Bryan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KEPRO Acquisitions, Inc.. (Long, William)
December 2, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by HDI Solutions, LLC re #14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Grayson, Bryan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Guy R. Dibenedetto, Jr re #14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Grayson, Bryan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Analytics Holdings, LLC re #14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Grayson, Bryan)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDARD BRIEFING ORDER: Briefing deadlines and instructions for all pending and future motions. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 11/22/2019. (amf, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Analytics Holdings, LLC, Guy R. Dibenedetto, Jr, HDI Solutions, LLC. (Grayson, Bryan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Analytics Holdings, LLC, Guy R. Dibenedetto, Jr, HDI Solutions, LLC. (Grayson, Bryan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Analytics Holdings, LLC, HDI Solutions, LLC, & Guy R. Dibenedetto, Jr.; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
November 20, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #13 NOTICE - Attorneys Stephen Errol Whitehead & Allison Rae Bendall for Analytics Holdings, LLC, Guy R. Dibenedetto, Jr & HDI Solutions, LLC added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Andrew Grayson on behalf of Analytics Holdings, LLC, Guy R. Dibenedetto, Jr, HDI Solutions, LLC (Grayson, Bryan)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 Motion to File Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Complaint Under Seal, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 11/18/2019. (wcl, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Admission of William F. Long Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 11/7/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KEPRO Acquisitions, Inc.. HDI Solutions, LLC served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Long, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KEPRO Acquisitions, Inc.. Analytics Holdings, LLC served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Long, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KEPRO Acquisitions, Inc.. Guy R. Dibenedetto, Jr served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Long, William)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by KEPRO Acquisitions, Inc. re #5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Long, William)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Alias Summons Issued as to Analytics Holdings, LLC, & HDI Solutions, LLC and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to KEPRO Acquisitions, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Analytics Holdings, LLC, Guy R. Dibenedetto, Jr, & HDI Solutions, LLC and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission of William F. Long Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 75.00, receipt number 4602055504) by KEPRO Acquisitions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(amf, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to File Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Complaint Under Seal by KEPRO Acquisitions, Inc.. (amf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (amf, ).
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Analytics Holdings, LLC, Guy R. Dibenedetto, Jr, HDI Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602055503), filed by KEPRO Acquisitions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Filing Fee Receipt) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEPRO Acquisitions, Inc. v. Analytics Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy R. Dibenedetto, Jr.
Represented By: Bryan Andrew Grayson
Represented By: Stephen Errol Whitehead
Represented By: Allison Rae Bendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Analytics Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bryan Andrew Grayson
Represented By: Stephen Errol Whitehead
Represented By: Allison Rae Bendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Bryan Andrew Grayson
Represented By: Stephen Errol Whitehead
Represented By: Allison Rae Bendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEPRO Acquisitions, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Montgomery Crofton
Represented By: William F. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?