JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Drake et al
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Country Casualty Insurance Company, Terrill Drake and Terill Drake
Case Number: 3:2019cv00872
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Terill Drake served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Hess, Joshua)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Terill Drake with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Unclaimed, Unable to Forward, Return to Sender". (amf, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Country Casualty Insurance Company. (wcl, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Country Casualty Insurance Company. (Brittain, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2019: #1 Corrected Signature Page) (wcl, ).
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Country Casualty Insurance Company.(Brittain, William)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Country Casualty Insurance Company, served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (amf, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Hess, Joshua) Modified on 11/15/2019 to add the link to the #3 Notice (amf, ).
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (amf, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Terill Drake & Country Casualty Insurance Company; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Country Casualty Insurance Company, Terill Drake (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602055684), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Filing Fee Receipt) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Drake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John David Collins
Represented By: Joshua Robert Hess
Represented By: Starr Turner Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William Evans Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrill Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terill Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?