Schonberger v. Loiselle et al
Plaintiff: Judy Schonberger
Defendant: Fidelity Investments, Inc., Jason Loiselle, Michael Schonberger, Loiselle Financial Group, LLC and The Charles L. Schonberger Revocable Trust
Case Number: 3:2020cv00015
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #26 MOTION for Extension of time; response to 25 Show Cause due no later than 4/1/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 3/6/2020. (NO PDF document attached to this notice).(djy, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Deadline To Show Cause re 25 Order to Show Cause,, Terminate Motions, by Judy Schonberger. (Connally, Joel)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER DENYING as moot #5 , #6 , and #8 MOTIONS TO DISMISS in light of the First Amended Complaint; Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by 3/18/2020 as to why #19 Motion to Dismiss should not be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 3/2/2020. (NO PDF Document attached to this notice).(djy, )
February 18, 2020 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Fidelity Investments, Inc. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-see docket entry #19 ). (djy, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by Michael Schonberger.(Corley, Jonathan)
February 18, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Loiselle Financial Group, LLC. (Stewart, Taffiny)
February 18, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Jason Loiselle, Loiselle Financial Group, LLC.(Stewart, Taffiny)
February 18, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Grey Redmond on behalf of Loiselle Financial Group, LLC (Redmond, Sarah)
February 18, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Taffiny Smith Stewart on behalf of Loiselle Financial Group, LLC (Stewart, Taffiny)
February 18, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Fidelity Investments, Inc.. (Mendez, Louis)
February 7, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Capel: #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 18 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fidelity Investments, Inc., Jason Loiselle, Michael Schonberger, Loiselle Financial Group, LLC, The Charles L. Schonberger Revocable Trust, filed by Judy Schonberger.(Connally, Joel)
February 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Davidson Connally on behalf of Judy Schonberger (Connally, Joel)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jason Loiselle. (Stewart, Taffiny)
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Judy Schonberger. (Jackson, Jason)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing that on or before 2/6/2020, plf shall file a response and show cause why the #5 , #6 and #8 MOTIONS TO DISMISS should not be granted; def may file a Reply on or before 2/13/2020; directing that on or before 2/6/2020, counsel for the parties to confirm consent electronically or to complete and send the appropriate attached for to the clerk. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/16/2020. (djy, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Judy Schonberger; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Frank Mendez on behalf of Fidelity Investments, Inc. (Mendez, Louis)
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Michael Schonberger. (Corley, Jonathan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Fidelity Investments, Inc.. (Donahue, David)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Fidelity Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trust Agreement)(Donahue, David)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Schonberger. (Corley, Jonathan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Michael Schonberger. (Corley, Jonathan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jason Loiselle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stewart, Taffiny)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Keith Corley on behalf of Michael Schonberger (Corley, Jonathan)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (all parties) Fidelity Investments, Inc., Jason Loiselle, Judy Schonberger, Michael Schonberger. (djy, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jason Loiselle. (djy, )
January 8, 2020 NOTICE to state court by Jason Loiselle re: filing of #1 Notice of Removal (NO PDF Document attached to this notice-See docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
January 8, 2020 CONSENT to #1 Notice of Removal by Michael Schonberger. (NO PDF Document attached to this notice-See docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
January 8, 2020 CONSENT to #1 Notice of Removal by Fidelity Investments, Inc. (NO PDF Document attached to this notice-See docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
January 8, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Judy Schonberger. (NO PDF Document attached to this notice-See docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
January 8, 2020 COMPLAINT against Fidelity Investments, Inc., Jason Loiselle, Michael Schonberger, filed by Judy Schonberger. (NO PDF Document attached to this notice-See docket entry #1 ).(djy, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jason Loiselle from Circuit Court of Tallapoosa County, Alabama, case number 62-CV-2019-900108.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056291) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-state court complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3-state court record, #4 Exhibit 4-consents to removal by Fidelity and Michael Schonberger, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Redacted Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schonberger v. Loiselle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Jones
Represented By: Louis Frank Mendez
Represented By: David Patrick Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Loiselle
Represented By: Sarah Grey Redmond
Represented By: Taffiny Smith Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schonberger
Represented By: Clinton Lewis Wilson
Represented By: Jonathan Keith Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loiselle Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Grey Redmond
Represented By: Taffiny Smith Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charles L. Schonberger Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Schonberger
Represented By: Jason Matthew Jackson
Represented By: Joel Davidson Connally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?