OPE-AL, LLC v. GFA INC. Alabama
Plaintiff: OPE-AL, LLC
Defendant: GFA INC. Alabama
Case Number: 3:2020cv00047
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Daniel Skipworth for GFA Inc. Alabama on 02/18/2020, filed by OPE-AL, LLC. (Weller, Christopher)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 Alias Summons issued as to GFA INC. Alabama and returned to counsel for service by process server. (cnw, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #3 Summons not signed for GFA INC. Alabama served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (cnw, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by OPE-AL, LLC as to GFA INC. Alabama with the following USPS notation: "Return to Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable to Forward" Plaintiff is notified via this notice that service has not be perfected. (kh, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) OPE-AL, LLC. (cnw, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GFA INC. Alabama; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cnw, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by OPE-AL, LLC. (cnw, )
January 17, 2020 STRICKEN - ENTERED IN ERROR) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by OPE-AL, LLC. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, ) Modified on 1/27/2020 (cnw, ).
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GFA INC. Alabama ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056396), filed by OPE-AL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 receipt)(cnw, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/27/2020) (cnw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OPE-AL, LLC v. GFA INC. Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OPE-AL, LLC
Represented By: Christopher William Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GFA INC. Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?