Harrell v. Backwater Marine Towing and Salvage, LLC. et al (CONSENT)
Plaintiff: Carlis Harrell
Defendant: Chad Gilliland and Backwater Marine Towing and Salvage, LLC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00121
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Backwater Marine Towing and Salvage, LLC., Chad Gilliland (kh, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Backwater Marine Towing and Salvage, LLC., Chad Gilliland. (Voss, Mickey)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Backwater Marine Towing and Salvage, LLC., Chad Gilliland.(Voss, Mickey)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by W. Crew for Backwater Marine Towing and Salvage, LLC. served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020; Chad Gilliland served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (kh, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Carlis Harrell (kh, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Backwater Marine Towing and Salvage, LLC. and Chad Gillilandmailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint and #2 corporate disclosure statement. (kh, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Carlis Harrell. (kh, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Backwater Marine Towing and Salvage, LLC., Chad Gilliland ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056910.), filed by Carlis Harrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrell v. Backwater Marine Towing and Salvage, LLC. et al (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlis Harrell
Represented By: Allen Durham Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Gilliland
Represented By: Mickey Jansen Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backwater Marine Towing and Salvage, LLC.
Represented By: Mickey Jansen Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?