James v. Rice Banking Company
Plaintiff: Willie James
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Rice Banking Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00129
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 Clerk's NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Dft Equifax Information Services, LLC re #4 Notice.(amf, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice and without Costs to Equifax Information Services, LLC only by Willie James (Landreau, Matthew)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Willie James. (Landreau, Matthew) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/3/2020 to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the proper date on both the pleading & the certificate of service as 3/3/19 & not 3/2/19) (amf, ). Modified on 3/3/2020 (amf, ).
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Willie James. (dmn, )
February 24, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Willie James. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 )
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Rice Banking Company ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056932.), filed by Willie James. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Rice Banking Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rice Banking Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie James
Represented By: Matthew Landreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?