United States of America for the use of Dixie Acoustical Contractors, Inc. v. Provision Contracting Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of Dixie Acoustical Contractors, Inc.
Defendant: Developers Surety and Indemnity Company and Provision Contracting Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00200
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO RULE 41 signed by DEBRA P. HACKETT, CLERK on 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cnw, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America for the use of Dixie Acoustical Contractors, Inc. (Sipes, Jade)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #5 Summons signed by Kelly Webster for Developers Surety and Indemnity Company served on 4/1/2020, answer due 4/22/2020. (cnw, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Provision Contracting Services, LLC & Developers Surety and Indemnity Company; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint & #2 and #3 Conflict Disclosure Statements. (amf, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plf United States of America for the use of Dixie Acoustical Contractors, Inc.. (amf, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America for the use of Dixie Acoustical Contractors, Inc.. (amf, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America for the use of Dixie Acoustical Contractors, Inc.. (amf, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Developers Surety and Indemnity Company, Provision Contracting Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602057379), filed by United States of America for the use of Dixie Acoustical Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the use of Dixie Acoustical Contractors, Inc. v. Provision Contracting Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of Dixie Acoustical Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Donald James Nettles
Represented By: Jade Eleanor Sipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provision Contracting Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?