Howard v. Lake Martin Community Hospital
Plaintiff: Pamela Howard
Defendant: Lake Martin Community Hospital
Case Number: 3:2020cv00213
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Lake Martin Community Hospital.(Treadwell, Mark) Modified on 5/18/2020 to clarify the docket text (bes, ).
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by illegible for Lake Martin Community Hospital served on 4/2/2020, answer due 4/23/2020. (bes, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lake Martin Community Hospital; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plf Pamela Howard. (amf, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Pamela Howard. (amf, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lake Martin Community Hospital (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602057403), filed by Pamela Howard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Lake Martin Community Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Howard
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Represented By: Ariel Seltzer Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Martin Community Hospital
Represented By: Mark Allen Treadwell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?