Giordano v. WestRock Company et al
Plaintiff: Anthony M. Giordano
Defendant: WestRock Coated Board, LLC and WestRock Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00221
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Anthony M. Giordano. (Grubb, Archibald) Modified on 5/19/2020 to clarify text to reflect as also in response to #16 RESPONSE (qc/djy, ).
May 11, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by WestRock Company. (Phillips, William)
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WestRock Company. (Phillips, William)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the defs as to why #10 Motion to Remand to State Court should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 5/11/2020; plf may file a reply on or before 5/18/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/27/2020. (djy, )
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/27/2020. (djy, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company. (Mays, Stephanie)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Anthony M. Giordano. (Grubb, Archibald)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Anthony M. Giordano. (Grubb, Archibald)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT vs WestRock Company, WestRock Coated Board LLC, and WestRock Services LLC against Anthony M. Giordano, filed by Anthony M. Giordano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2012 Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 2013 Mediation Settlement Memorandum, #3 Exhibit C - 2013 Settlement Petition, #4 Exhibit D - 2013 Order Approving Settlement, #5 Exhibit E - Barrett Letter)(Grubb, Archibald)
April 10, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (kh, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Anthony M. Giordano of Declination of Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Grubb, Archibald)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER : Upon consideration of Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #5 ) it is ORDERED that, on or before April 17, 2020, Plaintiff shall show cause, if any there be, why the motion should not be granted. Defendants may reply on or before April 24, 2020. Additionally, the parties were previously notified of the assignment of this case to a Magistrate Judge and their right to request reassignment. See Attached Explanation. As indicated in the notice of assignment, the parties must confirm their decision to consent to the Magistrate Judge in writing. Accordingly, any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judges jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before April 17, 2020. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 4/3/2020. (kh, )
April 3, 2020 BRIEF in Support filed by WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #5 for pdf)(kh, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS and BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE SAME by WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mays, Stephanie) Modified on 4/3/2020 to clarify the text (kh, ).
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Anthony M. Giordano. (Grubb, Archibald)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Anthony M. Giordano, WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company (kh, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company. (kh, )
March 27, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Anthony M. Giordano. (no pdf document attached to this entry - document entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
March 27, 2020 COMPLAINT against WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company, filed by Anthony M. Giordano.(no pdf document attached to this entry - document entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company from Circuit Court of Russell County, Alabama, case number 57-CV-2020-90041.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602057441) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giordano v. WestRock Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WestRock Coated Board, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie H. Mays
Represented By: William Brock Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WestRock Company
Represented By: Stephanie H. Mays
Represented By: William Brock Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony M. Giordano
Represented By: Archibald (Archie) Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Daniel Brian Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?