McMullin v. Robinson Bryant Insurance Agency
Plaintiff: Paul McMullin
Defendant: Robinson Bryant Insurance Agency
Case Number: 3:2020cv00314
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of ERROR re #8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joshua D Arisohn, which is hereby STRICKEN as an erroneous duplicate docket entry; See document #9 for correct entry. (am, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joshua D Arisohn by Paul McMullin. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Gulas, Theodore (ike))
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE #10 NOTICE OF ERROR) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joshua D Arisohn by Paul McMullin. (Gulas, Theodore (ike)) Modified on 7/6/2020 (am, ).
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 Copy of #6 Application and case file delivered to Clerk. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
June 25, 2020 Application to Clerk (Request) for Entry of Default against Robinson Bryant Insurance Agency, by Paul McMullin. (NO PDF - See doc #6 , which was incorrectly filed as a Motion.) (am, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 (APPLICATION) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Robinson Bryant Insurance Agency by Paul McMullin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Ike Gulas)(Gulas, Theodore (ike)) Modified on 6/26/2020 to clarify docket text as an Application not a Motion(am, ).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: GRANTING the #4 Motion for Max Stuart Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 6/15/2020. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
June 8, 2020 NOTICE of Appearance by Max S. Roberts on behalf of Paul McMullin. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #4 for pdf)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Max Stuart Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602058200.) by Paul McMullin. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by WB 0686 COVID-19 for Robinson Bryant Insurance Agency served on 5/23/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (dmn, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Robinson Bryant Insurance Agency and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
May 11, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Paul McMullin. (dmn, ) (no pdf see Doc. #1 )
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Robinson Bryant Insurance Agency ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602057893.), filed by Paul McMullin. (Attachments: #1 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMullin v. Robinson Bryant Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson Bryant Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul McMullin
Represented By: Max S. Roberts
Represented By: Theodore (ike) A Gulas
Represented By: Joshua D. Arisohn
Represented By: Max Stuart Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?