Collins v. Abid et al
Plaintiff: Angela Collins
Defendant: Bejamin Compton, Martha Abid, O'Neil Culver, East Alabama Medical Center doing business as East Alabama Medical Center, James Robert Cobb and Jason Tsai
Case Number: 3:2020cv00462
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Upon consideration of Plf's #6 notice of dismissal without prejudice, which comports with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the FRCP, Plf's action has been dismissed without prejudice by operation of Rule 41; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this action. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(bes, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding judge; Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (bes, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Angela Collins (Mann, Teddy)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as referral judge; Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (bes, )
July 7, 2020 Pursuant to the #5 Notice of Reassignment, Motions No Longer Referred: #3 MOTION to Stay, #1 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Quash Purported Service of Process (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jason Tsai. (Morris, George)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by Jason Tsai. (Morris, George). Added MOTION to Quash on 7/7/2020 pursuant to the PDF document (bes, ).
July 2, 2020 MOTION to Stay by O'Neil Culver. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #3 for PDF) (bes, )
July 2, 2020 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Martha Abid re #3 Notice of Removal. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #3 for PDF) (bes, )
July 2, 2020 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Jason Tsai re #3 Notice of Removal. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #3 for PDF) (bes, )
July 2, 2020 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by James Robert Cobb re #3 Notice of Removal. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #3 for PDF) (bes, )
July 2, 2020 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by East Alabama Medical Center re #3 Notice of Removal. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #3 for PDF) (bes, )
July 2, 2020 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Bejamin Compton re #3 Notice of Removal. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #3 for PDF) (bes, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by O'Neil Culver re #3 Notice of Removal. (bes, )
July 2, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Angela Collins. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #3 for PDF) (bes, )
July 2, 2020 COMPLAINT against Martha Abid, James Robert Cobb, Bejamin Compton, O'Neil Culver, East Alabama Medical Center, Jason Tsai, filed by Angela Collins. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #3 for PDF)(bes, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by O'Neil Culver from Circuit Court of Macon County, Alabama, case number 46-cv-2020-900077.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058445) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7 - Consents to Removal, #9 Exhibit 8 - Motion to Stay, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Receipt)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Abid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Collins
Represented By: Corbin Potter
Represented By: Teddy Lee Mann
Represented By: Richard Keith Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bejamin Compton
Represented By: Jack Buster Hinton, Jr.
Represented By: Ian Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Abid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Neil Culver
Represented By: Allison Alford Ingram
Represented By: Chalankis Brown
Represented By: Edward Hamilton Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Alabama Medical Center doing business as East Alabama Medical Center
Represented By: Joshua Jonathan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Robert Cobb
Represented By: Benjamin Collier Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Tsai
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?