Doleman v. Americredit Financial Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Doleman
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Americredit Financial Services, Inc. doing business as GM Financial, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00558
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 26 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (amf, )
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/5/2020; DIRECTING counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 9/29/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/28/2020. (amf, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by William Brock Phillips on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Phillips, William)
September 4, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendant Trans Union LLC. (amf, )
September 3, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #21 ANSWER- Attorney Holly Sass Bell for Defendant Trans Union LLC added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC. (Robinett, Matthew)
September 3, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trans Union LLC.(Robinett, Matthew)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (amf, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Young, Leilus)
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Young, Leilus)
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendant Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (amf, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Leeth, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2020: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (amf, ).
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Leeth, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2020: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (amf, ).
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Affidavit of Service) filed by Kenneth Doleman; Trans Union LLC served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. (Derry, Jason)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Affidavit of Service) filed by Kenneth Doleman; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. (Derry, Jason)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Affidavit of Service) filed by Kenneth Doleman; Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/3/2020. (Derry, Jason)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Correction re #10 Order, to attach a corrected PDF document to correctly spell the name of the Plaintiff; The last name of the Plaintiff was originally misspelled in error. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #10 )(amf, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant Equifax shall respond to the complaint on or before 10/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/2/2020. (amf, ) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/2/2020 to attach a corrected PDF document to correctly spell the last name of the Plaintiff) (amf, ). Modified on 9/2/2020 (amf, ).
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (amf, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Wynn, Mary)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Wynn, Mary)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/12/2020. (wcl, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Americredit Financial Services, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (wcl, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Kenneth Doleman. (amf, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Admit Jason R. Derry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 75.00, receipt number 4602058836), filed by Kenneth Doleman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jason R. Derry, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Receipt)(amf, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Kenneth Doleman. (amf, )
August 3, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Kenneth Doleman. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Americredit Financial Services, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602058835), filed by Kenneth Doleman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doleman v. Americredit Financial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: William Brock Phillips
Represented By: Mary Caroline Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americredit Financial Services, Inc. doing business as GM Financial
Represented By: Alan Daniel Leeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Leilus Jackson Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Holly Sass Bell
Represented By: Matthew Whittle Robinett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Doleman
Represented By: Jason R. Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?