Dennis v. Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marion Dennis
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00567
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 8/21/2020 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to USDC for the District of New Jersey. (cwl, )
August 19, 2020 *** Attorney Summer Austin Wells terminated pursuant to the 12 text order. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Summer Austin Wells to Withdraw. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/19/2020. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that on or before September 2, 2020, the Plaintiff shall show cause, if any there be, as to why the Defendants' motion (doc. #9 ) should not be granted. The Defendants may file a reply on or before September 9, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/19/2020. (kh, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Stay filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Parker, George)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Parker, George)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Summer Austin Wells to Withdraw as Attorney by Marion Dennis. (Wells, Summer) Modified on 8/14/2020 to clarify text (cwl, ).
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC.(Parker, George)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: it is ORDERED that on or before 8/26/2020, the Def shall show cause, if any there be, as to why the Plf's Motion to Remand (doc. #4 ) should not be granted; The Plf may file a reply on or before 9/2/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/12/2020. (cwl, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Marion Dennis. (Brooks, Gerald)
August 11, 2020 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Marion Dennis. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #4 for pdf) (cwl, )
August 11, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #4 MOTION - Attorney Christopher Daniel Baldwin for Marion Dennis added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Marion Dennis. (Brooks, Gerald) Modified on 8/11/2020 to correct mtn event (cwl, ).
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC. (cwl, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. (cwl, )
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #2 for pdf) (cwl, )
August 5, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Marion Dennis. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, )
August 5, 2020 COMPLAINT against Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, filed by Marion Dennis.(No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cwl, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC from Circuit Court of Macon County, Alabama, case number 46-cv-20-900103.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058890) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 receipt) (cwl, ) (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/7/2020 to attach the correct receipt) (cwl, ). Modified on 8/7/2020 (cwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis v. Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Dennis
Represented By: Gerald Clark Brooks, Jr.
Represented By: Tiffany L. Tolliver
Represented By: Summer Austin Wells
Represented By: Tiffany Tolliver
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Fred M. (Tripp) Haston, III
Represented By: George Robert Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC
Represented By: Fred M. (Tripp) Haston, III
Represented By: George Robert Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?