Rose v. Portofolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Maxyne Rose
Defendant: Portofolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00581
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: This matter is before the court on plaintiff's #11 notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice, which was filed pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) on 9/8/2020. Upon consideration of the same, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. See Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272 (11th Cir. 2012). Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Maxyne Rose (Philipps, David)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #4 Motion for David J. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/28/2020. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Maxyne Rose of Settlement (Philipps, David)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Portofolio Recovery Associates, LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (djy, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Portofolio Recovery Associates, LLC; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Maxyne Rose (kh, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Maxyne Rose. (kh, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for David J. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602058966.) by Maxyne Rose. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602058967.) by Maxyne Rose. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Wayne Botes on behalf of Maxyne Rose (kh, ) .
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portofolio Recovery Associates, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058965.), filed by Maxyne Rose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )
August 10, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Maxyne Rose. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Portofolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxyne Rose
Represented By: David J. Phillipps
Represented By: Bradford Wayne Botes
Represented By: Mary E. Phillipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Represented By: David Joseph Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portofolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?