Harris v. Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Harris
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma Limited
Case Number: 3:2020cv00609
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 (SECOND SUPPLEMENT in Further Support re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time and to Stay Proceedings) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Pace Order Granting Stay, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Thorn Order Granting Stay)(Turner, Sara) Modified on 9/24/2020 to clarify the docket text (amf, ).
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY in Further Support re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time and MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Turner, Sara)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Defendant Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.'s #12 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's #3 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Deborah Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CTO 31 Transfers)(Brooks, Gerald) Modified on 9/11/2020 to clean up text and create link. (dmn, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Deborah Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CTO 31 Transfers)(Brooks, Gerald) Modified on 9/11/2020 to create link. (dmn, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiff's #3 MOTION to Remand filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - CTO 31, #3 Exhibit C - Dennis Transfer Order CTO-29, #4 Exhibit D - Harris Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Smiley Pls Resp to Mot to Stay)(Turner, Sara) Modified on 9/8/2020 clean up text. (dmn, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Now pending before the Court is the Defendants motion for an extension of time and to stay (doc. #8 ) filed on August 24, 2020. Upon consideration of the motion, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that on or before September 11, 2020, the Plaintiff shall show cause why the motion for an extension of time and to stay should not be granted. It is further ORDERED that the Defendants may file a reply to the Plaintiff's response on or before September 18, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/28/2020. (dmn, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Turner, Sara)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Supplemental Filing in Support of Motion for Extension of Time and to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time and to Stay Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. E - CTO 31)(Turner, Sara)
August 24, 2020 MOTION to Stay Proceedings pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #8 for pdf)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time and to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Notice of Potential Tag-Along Actions, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Notice of Potential Tag-Along from the Middle District, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - JPML Transfer Order, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Dennis CTO)(Turner, Sara) Modified on 8/24/2020 to reflect actual title. (dmn, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF REMOVAL re Filing of #1 NOTICE of Removal with Circuit Court of Macon County, AL by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (Turner, Sara) Modified on 8/24/2020 to create link and clean up text. (dmn, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Deborah Harris re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Brooks, Gerald)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Defendants why the #3 Motion to Remand should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 9/4/2020; further ORDERED that the Plaintiff may file a reply to the Defendants' response on or before 9/11/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/21/2020. (amf, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff Deborah Harris; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Law in Support by Deborah Harris. (Brooks, Gerald)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (amf, )
August 19, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Deborah Harris. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF) (amf, )
August 19, 2020 COMPLAINT against Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., filed by Deborah Harris. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF)(amf, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. from Circuit Court of Macon County, AL, case number 46-CV-2020-900104.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602059100) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Represented By: Christopher Brian Saville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Harris
Represented By: Gerald Clark Brooks, Jr.
Represented By: Tiffany Toliver
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Baldwin
Represented By: Tiffany Tolliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?