Kiker v. Grizzard et al
Plaintiff: Tonya Kiker
Defendant: Kimberly Grizzard and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00711
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment; directing the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 12/14/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/30/2020. (djy, )
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why #5 Motion to Remand should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 11/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/30/2020. (djy, )
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tonya Kiker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berry, Keviin) Modified on 10/29/2020 to correct the docket text and remove a duplicate "exhibit"(kh, ). Modified on 10/30/2020 to remove extra erroneous motion event selection (qc/djy, ).
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Kimberly Grizzard, Tonya Kiker (kh, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kimberly Grizzard. (kh, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kimberly Grizzard.(kh, )
September 4, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tonya Kiker. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
September 4, 2020 COMPLAINT against Kimberly Grizzard, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Tonya Kiker.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kimberly Grizzard from Circuit Court of Macon County, Alabama, case number 46-CV-2020-900123.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602059354) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Filiing, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiker v. Grizzard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Kiker
Represented By: Kevin Lawrence Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Grizzard
Represented By: Alex Lafayette Holtsford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?