Denmark v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Johnnie Denmark
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00721
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint and corporate disclosure signed by Lawrence Beamon on US Attorney served on 9/18/2020, answer due for United States of America 11/18/2020. (djy, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint & #3 Conflict Disclosure Statement. (amf, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Johnnie Denmark (kh, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Johnnie Denmark. (kh, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Johnnie Denmark. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602059369.), filed by Johnnie Denmark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denmark v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Denmark
Represented By: Jason A. Shamblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?